Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchior Giedroyć

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
1571²35.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 157640.0AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
22 Apr 157640.3Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
6 Apr 160973.2DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Melchior Giedroyć (VIAF: 78828639)
Bishop Melchior Giedroyć (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilnius, Diocese of Vilnius
Ordained BishopVilnius, Diocese of Vilnius

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018