Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus Skuminowicz (Skumin)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1652AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Aug 1652AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
29 Sep 1652Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
24 Sep 1668DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Skuminowicz (Skumin):
Bishop Theodorus Skuminowicz (Skumin) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 197
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 115, Number 702
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015