Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Jerzy Bolesław Matulewicz-Matulaitis, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

Titular Archbishop of Adulis

Superior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary

Note/Previous Titular See: (Jurgis Matulevičius)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1871BornLugine
20 Nov 189827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
14 Jul 191140.3AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
23 Oct 191847.5AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Dec 191847.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Sep 192554.4ResignedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Sep 192554.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adulis
27 Jan 192755.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania
28 Jun 1987Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Jerzy Bolesław Matulewicz-Matulaitis:
Archbishop Bl. Jerzy Bolesław Matulewicz-Matulaitis M.I.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

  • a priest for 28.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,793
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,813
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 20 Dec 2013