Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ignacy Houwalt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1744BornBalbierzyszki
1769¹24.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 180460.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
20 Aug 180460.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
5 May 180762.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Houwalt:
Priest Ignacy Houwalt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Vilnius

  • a priest for 38.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013