Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Darius Trijonis

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Fissiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1973 Born
25 May 199623.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
18 May 199724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Telšiai (-Klaipeda), Lithuania
29 Sep 201744.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
29 Sep 201744.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Fissiana
16 Dec 201744.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fissiana

MicroData Summary for Darius Trijonis
Bishop Darius Trijonis (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTelšiai, Diocese of Telšiai (-Klaipeda)
Ordained BishopSts. Stanislaus and Ladislaus, Cathedral Basilica, Vilnius, Archdiocese of Vilnius

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Vilnius.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2017
  • od/c0: CB, 29 Sep 2017
  • ob: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,616

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast