Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Feliks Szaniawski

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1677¹BornPoznan
22 May 171336.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
12 Apr 171740.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
7 Dec 172245.9SelectedBishop of Chełm, Poland
29 Jan 172548.0ConfirmedBishop of Chełm, Poland
24 May 172952.3SelectedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Dec 173356.9DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Feliks Szaniawski:
Bishop Jan Feliks Szaniawski (born 1677, died ) Bishop of Chełm

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141, and Page 157
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 416
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 5 Sep 2015