Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Dowlaszewicz Billman, O.F.M. Conv.

Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Titular Bishop of Tigimma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1957 BornPodworańce, Belarus
8 Dec 198225.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Jun 198426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Dec 200043.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
21 Dec 200043.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigimma
13 Mar 200143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigimma

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Dowlaszewicz Billman:
Bishop Stanisław Dowlaszewicz Billman O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,930
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2000

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015