Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Kisiel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Białystok, Poland

Note/Previous Titular See: (AA for Polish territory)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1918Born
1941²22.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vilnius, Lithuania
14 Feb 194324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
3 May 197658.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania
3 May 197658.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
27 Jun 197658.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
5 Jun 199173.2AppointedBishop of Białystok, Poland
25 Mar 199274.0AppointedArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
15 May 199375.2RetiredArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
28 Sep 199375.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Białystok, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Kisiel (VIAF: 8221248)
Archbishop Edward Kisiel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Białystok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJundzillo
Ordained BishopBiałystok, Diocese of Białystok

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1993, Page 94
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,243
  • c01: CB, 23 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 5 Aug 2020

Quantcast