Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Kaszkiewicz

Bishop of Grodno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1949 BornEjszyszki
30 May 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 199141.5AppointedBishop of Grodno, Belarus
23 May 199141.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grodno, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Kaszkiewicz:
Bishop Aleksander Kaszkiewicz (born ) Bishop of Grodno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grodno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 5 Feb 2015