Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jerzy Cardinal Radziwiłł

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1556Born
11 Apr 157417.8Converted
18 Dec 157418.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
31 Dec 157923.5SucceededBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
10 Apr 158326.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 158327.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Dec 158327.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
14 Jul 158630.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
9 Aug 159135.1AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
25 May 159235.9InstalledBishop of Kraków, Poland
21 Jan 160043.6DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Radziwiłł (VIAF: 50140848)
Jerzy Cardinal Radziwiłł (born , died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁukiszki, Diocese of Vilnius
Ordained PriestRyga
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vilnius, Diocese of Vilnius
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Gesł, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 16.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
  • a cardinal for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 47, and Page 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Nov 2017