Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakub Ignacy Dederko

Deceased

Bishop of Minsk, Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1753Born
14 Aug 177017.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Aug 177623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
179844.4AppointedBishop of Minsk, Belarus
26 Aug 179845.1Ordained BishopBishop of Minsk, Belarus
13 Feb 182975.5DiedBishop of Minsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Jakub Ignacy Dederko
Bishop Jakub Ignacy Dederko (born , died ) Bishop of Minsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUszpole, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania
Ordained BishopVisitation de Notre Dame, Church, Płock, Diocese of Płock, Poland
Death PlaceOlyka

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,191
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 291
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,510
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast