Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gintaras Linas Grušas

Archbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Apostolic Administrator of Lithuania, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1961 Born
25 Jun 199432.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Jun 201048.7AppointedBishop of Lithuania, Military
4 Sep 201048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lithuania, Military
5 Apr 201351.5AppointedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Apr 201351.5InstalledArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Apr 201351.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lithuania, Military

MicroData Summary for Gintaras Linas Grušas
Archbishop Gintaras Linas Grušas (born ) Archbishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, USA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vilnius.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,780
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2013
  • ab: CB, 5 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast