Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Mikolaj Michalkiewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1865Born
23 Oct 188823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jan 192357.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jan 192357.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
10 Jun 192358.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
16 Feb 194075.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Mikolaj Michalkiewicz
Bishop Kazimierz Mikolaj Michalkiewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHopeniszki

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,036
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Oct 2018

Quantcast