Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas Jeronimas Krišpinas

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654BornSamogitien
2 Nov 168127.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 169440.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
30 Aug 169440.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
19 Sep 169541.7AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
14 Jul 170854.5DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jonas Jeronimas Krišpinas:
Bishop Jonas Jeronimas Krišpinas (died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 341, and Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013