Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Algimunt Holszański

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485¹Born
10 Sep 150722.6AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
24 Apr 151328.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
15 Mar 153651.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
4 Sep 155570.6DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paweł Algimunt Holszański (VIAF: 42151776730818010365)
Bishop Paweł Algimunt Holszański (born 1485, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 42.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 30 Jun 2015
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 229, and Page 334
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,515
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,513, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast