Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Bukraba

Deceased

Bishop of Pinsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1885³BornGrodno
2 Feb 190923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
10 Jul 193246.6AppointedBishop of Pinsk, Belarus
21 Aug 193246.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pinsk, Belarus
6 May 194660.5DiedBishop of Pinsk, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Bukraba:
Bishop Kazimierz Bukraba (born , died ) Bishop of Pinsk

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013