Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Henryk Materski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Radom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1923BornVilnius
20 May 194724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Białystok, Poland
29 Oct 196845.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
29 Oct 196845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
22 Dec 196845.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
6 Mar 198158.1AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
25 Mar 199269.2AppointedBishop of Radom, Poland
28 Jun 199976.4RetiredBishop of Radom, Poland
24 Mar 201289.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Radom, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Henryk Materski:
Bishop Edward Henryk Materski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Radom

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2015