Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Benedykt Feliks Towiański, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Carpasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1719³BornWidziniszki
22 Dec 174223.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 May 174323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 Dec 176647.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Dec 176647.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpasia
4 Jan 176747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpasia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Benedykt Feliks Towiański:
Bishop Tadeusz Benedykt Feliks Towiański O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148, and Page 454
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,189
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015