Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Karol Ogiński

Deceased

Bishop of Smoleńsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1680³Born
6 Dec 170323.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 170423.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 171737.1AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
5 Jun 171837.6Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
5 Sep 171938.9DiedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Karol Ogiński (VIAF: 311300595)
Bishop Ludwik Karol Ogiński (born , died ) Bishop of Smoleńsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDucoren, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vilnius, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania

  • a priest for 15.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 68
  • ob: CB, 30 Dec 2016
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast