Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Aleksander Samson Toczyłowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1741³BornRajgród
24 Feb 176523.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Mar 176523.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 178241.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Sep 178241.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
29 Dec 178241.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belline
14 Dec 179352.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
3 Aug 180766.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Piotr Aleksander Samson Toczyłowski:
Bishop Piotr Aleksander Samson Toczyłowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 119, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015