Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomasz Ignacy Zienkowicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1717³Born
9 Jul 174124.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 175538.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
21 Jul 175538.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
9 Nov 175538.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
22 Aug 176346.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Nov 178164.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
9 Dec 179073.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomasz Ignacy Zienkowicz:
Bishop Tomasz Ignacy Zienkowicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014