Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karol Hryniewicki

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1841BornPulsy
30 Mar 186725.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Nov 186725.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188341.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
7 May 188341.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
28 Dec 188948.0ResignedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Jun 189149.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
14 Apr 192987.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Karol Hryniewicki:
Archbishop Karol Hryniewicki (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 447, and Page 591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013