Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juozas Tunaitis

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Sassura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1928Born
12 Sep 195425.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 199162.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
8 May 199162.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sassura
19 May 199162.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sassura
4 Mar 201081.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
1 Jun 201283.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Juozas Tunaitis
Bishop Juozas Tunaitis (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDavainiškis

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,543
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 4 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Sep 2017