Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Kotowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornGrodno
4 Jun 167250.4SelectedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
27 Feb 167351.1ConfirmedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
9 Apr 168563.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
30 Nov 168664.9DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Kotowicz:
Bishop Aleksander Kotowicz (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 359, and Page 416
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015