Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Nieborski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornPłock
27 May 160729.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 163456.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jun 163456.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
18 Jun 163456.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
27 May 164466.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Nieborski:
Bishop Stanislaw Nieborski (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,937
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1634, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015