Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Józef Żółkowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Alalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1686³BornDolkobów
23 Jun 171529.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jul 171529.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 174458.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
7 Dec 174458.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
21 Feb 174558.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
19 Jan 176376.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Józef Żółkowski:
Bishop Antoni Józef Żółkowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,186
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 71, and Page 454
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 15 Oct 2013