Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel (Havrylo) Kolenda, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Administrator of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606²Born
1624²18.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1652¹46.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1652²46.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
Sep 1655³49.6SucceededArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
5 Oct 165549.7AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1664²58.0AppointedAdministrator of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Apr 166559.3AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 May 167468.3DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel (Havrylo) Kolenda:
Archbishop Gabriel (Havrylo) Kolenda O.S.B.M. (born 1606, died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 251, and Page 282
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015