Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacy Maria Dubowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz

Titular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1874BornVilnius, Lithuania
25 Mar 189925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
16 Oct 191642.5AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
28 Jan 191742.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
15 Feb 191742.8InstalledBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
1 Jun 192551.1ResignedBishop of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz, Ukraine
1 Jun 192551.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
10 Mar 195378.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Maria Dubowski:
Archbishop Ignacy Maria Dubowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,792
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,811
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013