Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arūnas Poniškaitis

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Sinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1966 Born
31 May 199225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
5 Feb 201043.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
5 Feb 201043.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinna
4 Mar 201043.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinna

MicroData Summary for Arūnas Poniškaitis
Bishop Arūnas Poniškaitis (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŠakiai

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Vilnius.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2010
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018