Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sandomierz

Dioecesis Sandomiriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Krzysztof Nitkiewicz, Bishop
  • Waclaw Swierzawski, Bishop Emeritus
  • Edward Marian Frankowski, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 25 March 1992
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lublin
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 7,850 (3,032 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.sandomierz.opoka.org.pl/
  • Mailing Address: ul. Mariacka 7, 27-600 Sandomierz, Polska
  • Telephone: (015)832.25.23; 832.25.38
  • Fax: 832.25.44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sandomierz
30 June 1818ErectedDiocese of Sandomierz (erected)
Diocese of Sandomierz-Radom
3 October 1981Name ChangedDiocese of Sandomierz Diocese of Sandomierz-Radom
25 March 1992SplitDiocese of Sandomierz-Radom Diocese of Radom
Diocese of Sandomierz
Diocese of Sandomierz
25 March 1992SplitDiocese of Sandomierz-Radom Diocese of Radom
Diocese of Sandomierz

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sandomierz
1950951,8301,075,67888.5%449364851,96246736248ap1951
19701,146,000165,000694.5%585756601,73694759271ap1971
19801,178,0001,221,00096.5%592816731,75092854273ap1981
Diocese of Sandomierz-Radom
19901,366,6401,396,00097.9%7071008071,693124766351ap1991
Diocese of Sandomierz
1999709,319729,47697.2%469585271,34583469229ap2000
2000709,274729,41897.2%470575271,34583470230ap2001
2001708,105728,14597.2%471705411,30898473231ap2002
2002707,695727,81397.2%485635481,29190471235ap2003
2003707,721727,94697.2%490615511,28473415236ap2004
2004707,270727,49597.2%493695621,25877424236ap2005
2010701,426721,64897.2%585686531,07479406239ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013