Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstanty Kazimierz Brzostowski

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649²BornVilnius
30 Apr 168536.3AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
15 Jul 168536.5Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
24 Nov 168738.8AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
24 Oct 172273.8DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konstanty Kazimierz Brzostowski:
Bishop Konstanty Kazimierz Brzostowski (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 37.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 359, and Page 416
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,956
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015