Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Jan Zienkowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1678¹BornWilno
27 Jun 171840.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
27 Jun 171840.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
6 Dec 171840.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
15 Apr 173052.2SelectedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
2 Oct 173052.7ConfirmedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Jan 176284.0DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Jan Zienkowicz:
Bishop Mikołaj Jan Zienkowicz (born 1678, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 231
  • b/c2+?: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,689
  • b/c2+?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 67
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015