Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Sawicki

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Turres Concordiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1887BornSubiele
2 May 190820.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Nov 196275.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania
23 Nov 196275.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Concordiae
2 Jun 196375.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Concordiae
20 May 196880.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Adam Sawicki:
Bishop Adam Sawicki (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Vilnius

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013