Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Stanisław Krasiński, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

Titular Bishop of Esbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1810BornVelniez
28 Mar 183625.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
23 May 183625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
27 Sep 185847.8AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
13 Feb 185948.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Mar 188372.2ResignedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
15 Mar 188372.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
9 May 189180.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Adam Stanisław Krasiński:
Bishop Adam Stanisław Krasiński Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vilnius

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Sep 2014