Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustachy Stanisław Kotowicz

Deceased

Bishop of Smoleńsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1637³Born
12 Jun 166123.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vilnius, Lithuania
26 Jun 166123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 May 168850.5AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
17 Oct 168850.9Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
21 Mar 170466.3DiedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustachy Stanisław Kotowicz (VIAF: 163136598)
Bishop Eustachy Stanisław Kotowicz (born , died ) Bishop of Smoleńsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOdelsk, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vilnius, Diocese of Vilnius, Lithuania

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,688, Number 47
  • b/c2+: CB, 30 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast