Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kajetan Cywiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1772Born
24 May 179522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jul 179523.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 184068.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 Dec 184068.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
24 Aug 184169.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
17 Nov 184674.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jan Kajetan Cywiński (VIAF: 161966580)
Bishop Jan Kajetan Cywiński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuźmiczach

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 173
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,841, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast