Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Tabor

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1453¹Born
11 Apr 149239.2AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
Sep 1492²39.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
27 Mar 150754.2DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Tabor
Bishop Wojciech Tabor (born 1453, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Death PlaceŁabunary, Diocese of Vilnius

  • a bishop for 14.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 2, Number 269
  • b: CB, 26 May 2018
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,699

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast