Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Piotr Pancerzyński

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1712AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
5 Oct 1712AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
24 Sep 1721AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
11 Sep 1724AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Feb 1729DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Karol Piotr Pancerzyński:
Bishop Karol Piotr Pancerzyński (died ) Bishop of Vilnius

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 220, and Page 359
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013