Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Ivan de Azevedo, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1926 BornSão Paulo
14 Jan 195023.7ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Dec 195327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 May 198660.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Jul 198660.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Feb 198861.8SucceededBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
23 Jan 200275.7RetiredBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Walter Ivan de Azevedo:
Bishop Walter Ivan de Azevedo S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013