Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Osvaldo Giuntini

Bishop Emeritus of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1936 Born
8 Dec 196327.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 198245.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Jun 198245.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
12 Sep 198245.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tunnuna
30 Apr 198750.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Dec 199256.1SucceededBishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 May 201376.5RetiredBishop of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Osvaldo Giuntini
Bishop Osvaldo Giuntini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Marília

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paolo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopJundiaí, Diocese of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Marília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast