Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Rolim Loureiro

Deceased

Bishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1908Born
15 Aug 193426.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 194839.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
22 May 194839.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bria
15 Aug 194840.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bria
4 Aug 196253.9AppointedBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Aug 197566.9DiedBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Rolim Loureiro
Bishop Paulo Rolim Loureiro (born , died ) Bishop of Mogi das Cruzes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorocaba

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,948, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast