Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Ernest Novak, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1930Born
2 Aug 195121.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jul 195626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Apr 197948.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
19 Apr 197948.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
27 May 197948.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
15 Mar 198958.7AppointedBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
2 Aug 200676.1RetiredBishop of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil
3 Dec 201484.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Paranaguá, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Ernest Novak
Bishop Alfredo Ernest Novak C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paranaguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDwight, NE, USA

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2006
  • d: CB, 4 Dec 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast