Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Beni dos Santos

Bishop Emeritus of Lorena, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1937 BornLagoinha
22 Dec 196225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Nov 200164.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Nov 200164.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
9 Feb 200265.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
9 Mar 200265.1InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
26 Apr 200669.2AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Sep 201376.6RetiredBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Beni dos Santos:
Bishop Benedito Beni dos Santos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lorena

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lorena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,131
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015