Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Maria Alves de Siqueira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1906BornSão Paulo
15 Aug 193023.8Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 May 194740.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 May 194740.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arycanda
20 Jul 194740.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arycanda
19 Jul 195750.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jul 195750.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria
27 Oct 196660.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Sep 196861.8SucceededArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Feb 198275.2RetiredArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Apr 199386.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Maria Alves de Siqueira:
Archbishop Antônio Maria Alves de Siqueira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013