Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Barbosa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1911Born
6 Dec 193625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Jan 195846.7AppointedBishop of Campo Grande, Brazil
1 May 195846.9Ordained BishopBishop of Campo Grande, Brazil
27 Nov 197867.5AppointedArchbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
12 Dec 198675.5RetiredArchbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
3 May 199381.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Barbosa
Archbishop Antônio Barbosa S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Campo Grande

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017