Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Paulo Alves de Souza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Espírito Santo

Titular Bishop of Orisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1873BornSão Paulo
29 Feb 189623.1Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Jan 191845.0AppointedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
21 Apr 191845.2Ordained BishopBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
28 Jul 193360.5ResignedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
28 Jul 193360.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Orisa
3 Apr 194673.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Espírito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Paulo Alves de Souza:
Bishop Benedito Paulo Alves de Souza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Espírito Santo

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013