Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Parrado Carral

Bishop of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1946 Born
10 Dec 197226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Jan 200154.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
3 Jan 200154.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
10 Mar 200154.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
9 Jan 200861.2AppointedBishop of São Miguel Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Parrado Carral
Bishop Manuel Parrado Carral (born ) Bishop of São Miguel Paulista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Román, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Miguel Paulista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,926

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast