Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Cândido Alvarenga

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1836BornSão Paulo
27 Dec 185721.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of São Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 186023.9Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
24 Apr 187741.0SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
21 Sep 187741.4ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
31 Mar 187841.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
28 Nov 189862.6AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 189962.9InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
1 Apr 190366.9DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Cândido Alvarenga:
Bishop Antônio Cândido Alvarenga (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 352, and Page 444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013