Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Júlio Endi Akamine, S.A.C.

Archbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1962 Born
8 Dec 198018.0ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
24 Jan 198825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
4 May 201148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
4 May 201148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
9 Jul 201148.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagamuta
28 Dec 201654.1AppointedArchbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Feb 201754.2InstalledArchbishop of Sorocaba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Júlio Endi Akamine
Archbishop Júlio Endi Akamine S.A.C. (born ) Archbishop of Sorocaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarça, Diocese of Marília, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sorocaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,112
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016
  • i: CB, 11 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017