Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Paulino Bueno Couto, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1910BornItú
9 Jun 193323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
26 Oct 194636.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jaboticabal, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Oct 194636.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
15 Dec 194636.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
1954²43.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Curitiba, Parana, Brazil
1955²44.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1965²54.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Nov 196656.4AppointedBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Mar 198271.7DiedBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Paulino Bueno Couto:
Bishop Gabriel Paulino Bueno Couto O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Jundiaí

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013